This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 09:58:24 (UTC).

ORTIZ et al v. MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 ORTIZ filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00411

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAUVONIQUE TISBY

ROBERT ORTIZ

Defendants

MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC.

MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah E. Storch

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 W Sr 84 , Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Richard D. Guadagnolo

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, Ste 103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

Amy R. Turci

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

225 Water St Ste 710

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5145

Chang Yu

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

4208 Six Forks Rd Ste 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Settlement; adopting #14 Report and Recommendations. The case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/8/2019. (SEJ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#15

(#15) Joint NOTICE of Non Objection to #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice, filed by ROBERT ORTIZ, DAUVONIQUE TISBY. (Storch, Noah) Modified on 7/1/2019 to edit text. (TMC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#14

(#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/26/2019. (TAM) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit B- Settlement Agreement Tisby

13 #1

Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement Ortiz

#13

(#13) Joint Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and for Dismissal with Prejudice, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement Ortiz, #2 Exhibit B- Settlement Agreement Tisby)(Storch, Noah) Modified on 6/19/2019 to create docket entry relationship, correct docket event type and edit text. (TMC) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER taking under advisement #11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice. The parties' joint supplemental memorandum due by 6/21/19. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/7/2019. (TAM) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and for Dismissal with Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER re #9 notice of settlement, referring this case for R&R on the parties' FLSA settlement agreement. The parties have until 6/3/2019 to file settlement documents. The Clerk shall administratively close the file. (SEJ) (JSG). Modified on 5/6/2019 to swap PDF and edit text per Chambers (JSG). (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of settlement by ROBERT ORTIZ (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

7 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for CHANG YU to appear pro hac vice by MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Turci, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 04/24/2019)

6 #1

Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form

#6

(#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 and FLSA Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#5

(#5) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC.(Turci, Amy) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to counsel Chang Yu of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (TMC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC with Jury Demand filed by ROBERT ORTIZ, DAUVONIQUE TISBY. (Filed in State Court on 03/11/2019)(TMC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Settlement; adopting #14 Report and Recommendations. The case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/8/2019. (SEJ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint NOTICE of Non Objection to #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice, filed by ROBERT ORTIZ, DAUVONIQUE TISBY. (Storch, Noah) Modified on 7/1/2019 to edit text. (TMC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/26/2019. (TAM) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and for Dismissal with Prejudice, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement Ortiz, #2 Exhibit B- Settlement Agreement Tisby)(Storch, Noah) Modified on 6/19/2019 to create docket entry relationship, correct docket event type and edit text. (TMC) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER taking under advisement #11 Joint Motion Requesting Order Approving Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss Lawsuit With Prejudice. The parties' joint supplemental memorandum due by 6/21/19. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/7/2019. (TAM) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and for Dismissal with Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER re #9 notice of settlement, referring this case for R&R on the parties' FLSA settlement agreement. The parties have until 6/3/2019 to file settlement documents. The Clerk shall administratively close the file. (SEJ) (JSG). Modified on 5/6/2019 to swap PDF and edit text per Chambers (JSG). (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of settlement by ROBERT ORTIZ (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Chang Yu, appearing on behalf of MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030697.) Related document: #7 MOTION for CHANG YU to appear pro hac vice. (AFC) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. If Chang Yu, Esq., has not already done so, she shall immediately pay the admission fee and register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/25/2019. (TSP) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for CHANG YU to appear pro hac vice by MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Turci, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 and FLSA Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC.(Turci, Amy) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to counsel Chang Yu of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (TMC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against MASTERCRAFT FLOOR COVERING, INC., MASTERCRAFTFC, LLC with Jury Demand filed by ROBERT ORTIZ, DAUVONIQUE TISBY. (Filed in State Court on 03/11/2019)(TMC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-411-J-33JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Flager County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000166 filed in State Court on 03/11/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15339344 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turci, Amy) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. Guadagnolo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah E. Storch