This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 09:18:56 (UTC).

Ortiz-De Lozano v. N.A.R., Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Ortiz-De Lozano filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against N A R , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01774

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juana Ortiz-De Lozano

Defendants

N.A.R., Inc.

N.A.R., Inc. doing business as North American Recovery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erik-Anthony W Fox

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Jamie S Cogburn

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Donna M. Armenta

4955 S. Durango Suite 174

Las Vegas, NV 89113

Jason M. Kerr

Attorney at Price Parkinson & Kerr, PLLC

5742 West Harold Gatty Drive

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Ronald F. Price

Attorney at Price Parkinson & Kerr, PLLC

5742 West Harold Gatty Drive

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Declaration Supporting Declaration of Erik W. Fox, Esq.

#14

(#14) Counter MOTION for Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) Relief re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. Responses due by 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Declaration of Erik W. Fox, Esq.) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. Replies due by 11/29/2021. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER Denying #10 Motion to Stay Discovery without prejudice for failure to meet and confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/16/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified Judge's name on 11/18/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

9 #1

Declaration Jameson Murray

#9

(#9) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Class Claims, or in the Alternative, to Deny Class Certification, by Defendant N.A.R., Inc. Responses due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jameson Murray) (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason M. Kerr on behalf of Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by N.A.R., Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Armenta, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2021. (Armenta, Donna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. N.A.R., Inc. served on 9/27/2021. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to N.A.R., Inc. (DRS) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Counter MOTION for Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) Relief re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. Responses due by 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Declaration of Erik W. Fox, Esq.) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. Replies due by 11/29/2021. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Denying #10 Motion to Stay Discovery without prejudice for failure to meet and confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/16/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified Judge's name on 11/18/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ronald F. Price to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/29/2021. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Class Claims, or in the Alternative, to Deny Class Certification, by Defendant N.A.R., Inc. Responses due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jameson Murray) (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason M. Kerr on behalf of Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by N.A.R., Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Armenta, Donna) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant N.A.R., Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2021. (Armenta, Donna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. N.A.R., Inc. served on 9/27/2021. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to N.A.R., Inc. (DRS) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against N.A.R., Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6643602) by Juana Ortiz-De Lozano. Proof of service due by 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N.A.R. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald F. Price

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason M. Kerr