This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:39:33 (UTC).

Ortega v. Sazerac Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Ortega filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Sazerac Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10993

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Ortega

Defendant

Sazerac Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Phillip Rubin

Attorney at Law Office Of Jonathan P. Rubin PLLC

3000 Marcus Ave., Ste 1E5

Lake Success, NY 11042

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorney

Sean Joseph Kirby

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sazerac Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25502921)Document filed by Juan Ortega..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sazerac Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Juan Ortega..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sazerac Company, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by February 21, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by February 21, 2022, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by February 21, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #3

Exhibit C

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sazerac Company, Inc...(Kirby, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Juan Ortega..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Juan Ortega..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sazerac Company, Inc...(Kirby, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sazerac Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kirby, Sean) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by February 21, 2022, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by February 21, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by February 21, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sazerac Company, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sazerac Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Juan Ortega..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sazerac Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25502921)Document filed by Juan Ortega..(Rubin, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAZERAC COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEAN J. KIRBY