This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 11:46:32 (UTC).

ORR v. ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 ORR filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03240

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLOTTE ORR

Defendant

ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Frederick Biesecker

Ryan William Sullivan

Defendant Attorneys

Krysta Kaye Gumbiner

Allison Louise Goico

Lindsey N. Boyd

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #23 Approved and Entered as an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/8/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) MOTION for Protective Order AGREED, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2021. Discovery due by 11/5/2021. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/2/2021. (GD) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#24

(#24) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/2/2021. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/2/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Louise Goico on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Goico, Allison) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey N. Boyd on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Boyd, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. . (Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to CHARLOTTE ORR. (Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLOTTE ORR. (Biesecker, Kyle) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLOTTE ORR. (Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC..(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #23 Approved and Entered as an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/8/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Protective Order AGREED, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2021. Discovery due by 11/5/2021. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/2/2021. (GD) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/2/2021. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/2/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Louise Goico on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Goico, Allison) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey N. Boyd on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Boyd, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. . (Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Lindsey N. Boyd for ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/21/2021. (JD) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Allison Louise Goico for ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/21/2021. (JD) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC..(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by CHARLOTTE ORR. ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 12/29/2020. (Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta Kaye Gumbiner on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to CHARLOTTE ORR. (Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLOTTE ORR. (Biesecker, Kyle) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLOTTE ORR. (Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC., filed by CHARLOTTE ORR. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6332001) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less