This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2019 at 07:44:23 (UTC).

O'Rourke v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 O'Rourke filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosanna Malouf Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rosanna Malouf Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin O'Rourke

Spokane, WA 99201

Debtor

Alma Briseida Avila

Defendants

Ashley Loyd

JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Daniel O'Rourke

Attorney at Southwell & O'Rourke PS

West 421 Riverside Avenue, Suite 960

Spokane, WA 99201

Debtor Attorney

Kevin W Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Freebourn PLLC

1325 West 1St Avenue, Suite 303

Spokane, WA 99201

Defendant Attorneys

Helen M McFarland

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

999 Third Avenue, Suite 1900

Seattle, WA 98104

Brett Greving

Attorney at Cozen OConnor - CA

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Anneliese Wermuth

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - IL

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#7

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order granting Stipulation to Submit Plaintiff

#6

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

#2

1 #5

Notice to Plaintiff re: Removal

1 #4

Notice of State Court Filed Documents

1 #3

Complaint

1 #2

Declaration of Helen McFarland in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY ACTION AND SUBMIT PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Stay Action and Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order granting Stipulation to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration and Staying Action)(Greving, Brett) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Anneliese Wermuth and Brett Greving having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, and Defendant Ashley Loyd. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketPayment Received. Receipt #SPO035418 in the amount of $400 from Helen McFarland re Pro Hac Vice Motions for Anneliese Wermuth and Bret Greving. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Brett Greving. Filing fee $ 200. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Anneliese Wermuth. Filing fee $ 200. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Received. Receipt #SPO035412 in the amount of $400 from Helen McFarland. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation. (McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketPayment for Civil Case (Filing fee $ 400).. (McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketPayment for Civil Case (Filing fee $ 400).. (McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400 Filed by Ashley Loyd, an individual, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Helen McFarland in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint, #4 Notice of State Court Filed Documents, #5 Notice to Plaintiff re: Removal)(McFarland, Helen) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant