This case was last updated from PACER on 01/22/2021 at 09:05:01 (UTC).

Claudia Oropeza v. Randstad US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Claudia Oropeza filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Randstad US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02456

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claudia Oropeza

Defendants

Linda Roeck

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Randstad US LLC

Randstad General Partner (US), LLC

Randstad General Partner US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tonette J Jaramilla

Attorney at Toni Jaramilla Law Offices APLC

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

May Mallari

Attorney at Toni J Jaramilla Law Offices APLC

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Denise Tran-Nguyen

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

501 West Broadway Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

Ofelia Mishell Parreno Taylor

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

501 West Broadway Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment 1: Request for Judicial Notice #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: A Request for Judicial Notice should be e-filed as a separate, stand-alone document using the event Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents-For Judicial Notice In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#18

(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan - Joint Report of Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F) and Local Rule 26-1 ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner US, LLC, Linda Roeck.. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#13

(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on November 23, 2020. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Linda Roeck re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Linda Roeck in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1332, 1441, and 1446 filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Karen Lubrano re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Denise Tran-Nguyen re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Denise Tran-Nguyen in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Defendant filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. Defendants' Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck, identifying Randstad North America, Inc.. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#1

(#10) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. Exhibits A-C to Notice of Removal as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) First REQUEST for Leave of May Mallari to Appear for Telephonic Appearance of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Claudia Oropeza. Request set for hearing on 2/1/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Telephonic Appearance) (Jaramilla, Tonette) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment 1: Request for Judicial Notice #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: A Request for Judicial Notice should be e-filed as a separate, stand-alone document using the event Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents-For Judicial Notice In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan - Joint Report of Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F) and Local Rule 26-1 ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner US, LLC, Linda Roeck.. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST for Order for Telephonic or Zoom Appearance at the Scheduling Conference - Defendants' Request for a Telephonic or Zoom Appearance at the Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner US, LLC, Linda Roeck. Request set for hearing on 2/1/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Their Request for a Telephonic or Zoom Appearance at the Scheduling Conference, #2 Proposed Order) (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Claudia Oropeza.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Diggs, Rodney) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Claudia Oropeza. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Diggs, Rodney) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge David O. Carter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02456 DOC (SPx). (car) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. Exhibits A-C to Notice of Removal as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on November 23, 2020. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Linda Roeck re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Linda Roeck in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1332, 1441, and 1446 filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Karen Lubrano re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Denise Tran-Nguyen re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Declaration of Denise Tran-Nguyen in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Defendant filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. Defendants' Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck, identifying Randstad North America, Inc.. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC, Linda Roeck. (Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2017879 Receipt No: ACACDC-29154039 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Linda Roeck, Randstad General Partner (US), LLC, Randstad US LLC. (Attorney Denise Tran-Nguyen added to party Randstad General Partner (US), LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Denise Tran-Nguyen added to party Randstad US LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Denise Tran-Nguyen added to party Linda Roeck(pty:dft))(Tran-Nguyen, Denise) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDSTAD GENERAL PARTNER (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RANDSTAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tonette J Jaramilla