This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:56:39 (UTC).

Ornelas v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ornelas filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David B. Fannin and David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David B. Fannin

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederico Ornelas

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at Lemberg Law, LLC

43 Danbury Road

Wilton, CT 06897

Defendant Attorney

Merritt N. Spencer

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

720 Brazos Street, Suite 700

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frederico Ornelas. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (ab1) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC amending, filed by Frederico Ornelas.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038256). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Frederico Ornelas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Spencer, Merritt) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Frederico Ornelas. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Frederico Ornelas. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge David Counts. Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint that supersedes his original Complaint and renders moot the Motion to Dismiss. See King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC amending, filed by Frederico Ornelas.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Spencer, Merritt) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frederico Ornelas. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (ab1) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Frederico Ornelas. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Frederico Ornelas. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038256). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Frederico Ornelas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.