This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:47:38 (UTC).

ORLANDO v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by ORLANDO against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17123

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAUREEN ORLANDO

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915363) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MAUREEN ORLANDO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MATHEWS, DAVID) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 8/23/19, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915363) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MAUREEN ORLANDO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MATHEWS, DAVID) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.