This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2021 at 07:35:08 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Universal Shopping Plaza et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Orlando Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Universal Shopping Plaza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10080

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10

Universal Shopping Plaza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Hyunsuk A Chang

Attorney at Albert Chang Law Offices

1225 West 190Th Street Suite 420

Gardena, CA 90248

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

Declaration

12 #1

Declaration

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10 answer now due 1/15/2021; Universal Shopping Plaza answer now due 1/15/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10; Universal Shopping Plaza.(Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10(pty:dft), Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Universal Shopping Plaza(pty:dft))(Chang, Hyunsuk) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Universal Shopping Plaza served on 12/5/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brittany Huang (Receptionist -Authorized to accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10 served on 11/26/2020, answer due 12/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phillip Tam- Management in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION. The Court has reviewed the Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lc) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garciato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING BY COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE UNRUH ACT CLAIM AND ANY OTHER STATE LAW CLAIM ASSERTED IN THE COMPLAINT WITH 14 DAYS. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Courts dismissal of the entire action without prejudice, or the Courts declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 USC 1367 (c). (lc) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi:ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AS ENUMERATED THEREIN). Monetary sanctions will be imposed for failure to comply. The first failure to comply with this Order will result in a sanction of $300.00, the second failure will result in a sanction of $450.00, and any further failure will result in a sanction of $750.00. (lc) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AND SERVICE OF THIS ORDER ON ALL PARTIES BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT IF CASE CAME TO THE COURT AS A PETITION FOR REMOVAL) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (smo) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Chung Chou City, Inc. No. 10, Universal Shopping Plaza. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28832915 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond George Ballister, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock