This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2021 at 08:58:24 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Donel Investments L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Orlando Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Donel Investments L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Donahue and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10653

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

Donel Investments L.L.C.

HG Tobacco Mart Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of and alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. 12010-12213, and a claim for damages pursuant to California's Unruh Civil Rights Act ("Unruh Act"), Cal. Civ. Code 51-53. It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, and any other state law claim that plaintiff may have alleged, pursuant to the Court's supplemental jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(a). (Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (gga) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Donel Investments L.L.C., HG Tobacco Mart Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29149314 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clive Handy