This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 19:40:39 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Orlando Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00361

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

DOES 1-10

Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Zachary Manning Best

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D Vogel

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PLLC

215 South State Street Suite 760

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Monica H Bullock

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Specterum Center Drive Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92679

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia.(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiff's acceptance of Defendants Rule 68 Offer of Judgment #15 , it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: Judgment will be taken against Defendant in the amount of $4,500.00 and all taxable costs and reasonable attorneys fees incurred to date or otherwise recoverable in this case. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS RE REQUIREMENTS AND COMPLIANCE AND DEADLINES) The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 4/20/2021 (lc). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

15 #4

Proof of Service

15 #3

EXHIBIT 3

15 #2

EXHIBIT 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

15 #15

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B- Answer to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment, ADR

1 #1

Declaration Monica H. Bullock

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia.(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiff's acceptance of Defendants Rule 68 Offer of Judgment #15 , it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: Judgment will be taken against Defendant in the amount of $4,500.00 and all taxable costs and reasonable attorneys fees incurred to date or otherwise recoverable in this case. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS RE REQUIREMENTS AND COMPLIANCE AND DEADLINES) The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 4/20/2021 (lc). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Order for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Price, Dennis) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST for Order for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Dennis Jay Price, II added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla)) (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the Notice of Settlement #13 , which states that the parties have settled the matter, this action is placed on inactive status. By April 19, 2021, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of thisaction. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Offer of Judgment #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): Clarification of the above. Pdf document is a combined Notice of Offer of Judgment and Acceptance of Offer of judgment, instead of each document being separately filed under their own specific event by their own respective party. The Main document is the acceptance, whereas the offer is the second document. Missing proposed judgment which should have been formally prepared for the Court and as a attachment to the main document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for May 3, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) served on January 14, 2021. (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/31/2021, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia in Los Angles Superior Court on 9/29/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. Related Case(s): None (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments, identifying Orlando Garcia and Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. (Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20SMCV01391 Receipt No: ACACDC-30041224 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Monica H. Bullock, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment, ADR, #3 Exhibit B- Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Monica H Bullock added to party Dawn Dee Motel and Apartments(pty:dft))(Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAWN DEE MOTEL AND APARTMENTS A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Hartman Bullock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D Vogel