This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 10:46:38 (UTC).

Orlando Garcia v. Amber Investment Group Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Orlando Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Amber Investment Group Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10397

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

One JT3, LLC

One JT5, LLC

Amber Investment Group Inc.,

TBB Valley Investments, LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Elliott Charles Montgomery

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

David Lalazarian

Attorney at Knapp Petersen and Clark

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STATEMENT of Case filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. Filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #16 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. This case is referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 2/15/2021. (lom) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Application or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#16

(#16) REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,. (Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,, (Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,.(Attorney David Lalazarian added to party Amber Investment Group Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT3, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT5, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party TBB Valley Investments, LLC,(pty:dft))(Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant One JT5, LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rochelle Burris Legal Assistant (Authorized to accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (gga) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#1

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,.(Attorney David Lalazarian added to party Amber Investment Group Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT3, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT5, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party TBB Valley Investments, LLC,(pty:dft))(Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATEMENT of Case filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. Filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #16 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. This case is referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 2/15/2021. (lom) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Application or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,. (Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,, (Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC,.(Attorney David Lalazarian added to party Amber Investment Group Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT3, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party One JT5, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lalazarian added to party TBB Valley Investments, LLC,(pty:dft))(Lalazarian, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant One JT5, LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rochelle Burris Legal Assistant (Authorized to accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant One JT3, LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rochelle Burris Legal Assistant (Authorized to accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of and alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. 12010-12213, and a claim for damages pursuant to California's Unruh Civil Rights Act ("Unruh Act"), Cal. Civ. Code 51-53. It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, and any other state law claim that plaintiff may have alleged, pursuant to the Court's supplemental jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(a). (Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (gga) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amber Investment Group Inc.,, One JT3, LLC, One JT5, LLC, TBB Valley Investments, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28994570 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TBB Valley Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMBER INVESTMENT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elliott Charles Montgomery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II