This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 07:18:29 (UTC).

Oriska Corporation v. North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Oriska Corporation filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02050

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Defendants

Mr. Benjamin Landa

Benjamin Fishoff

Roberta Reardon

Jacob Pollack

John Doe

Ira Lipsius

Broad Coverage Services, Inc.

Israel Ziegelman

Robert Kolman

Cullen & Dykman LLP

Wolf Eisenbach

National Financial Service

Financial Service

Scott Dietrich

Raphael A. Weitzner

Israel Pollack

Michael Schweimmer

Alan Chopp

Martha Lees

Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

James M. Kernan

Attorney at Kernan Professional Group, LLP

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Ira S. Lipsius

Attorney at Lipsius-BenHaim Law, LLP

80-02 Kew Gardens Rd, Suite 1030

Kew Gardens, NY 11415

Frank Policelli

Attorney at Frank Policelli Attorney at Law

10 Steuben Park

Utica, NY 13501

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re: Attorneys' Fees by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#13

(#13) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#11

(#11) Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re: Motion to Remand by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for pre motion conference re: Motion to Remand by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. by Oriska Corporation (Policelli, Frank) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

7 #6

#4- Judge Libert Order

7 #5

#3 Attachment to Memorandum-Brief to Panel

7 #4

#2 Attachment to Memorandum-Schedule of Actions

7 #3

#1 Attachment to Memorandum-JPML Motion

7 #2

Memorandum

7 #1

Declaration

#7

(#7) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum, #3 #1 Attachment to Memorandum-JPML Motion, #4 #2 Attachment to Memorandum-Schedule of Actions, #5 #3 Attachment to Memorandum-Brief to Panel, #6 #4- Judge Libert Order) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge (Kernan, James) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge from Suffolk County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019-621892. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14377928) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kernan, James) Modified on 4/20/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re: Attorneys' Fees by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re: Motion to Remand by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrdered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/17/2021. In light of the reassignment of this case to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, the pre motion conference scheduled for 6/30/2021 before the undersigned is canceled. (Johnston, Linda)c/ecf (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara (as related to 20cv6291) for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/14/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference..A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for June 30, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address defendant North Sea Associates, LLC's anticipated motion to remand the action to state court, DE 10. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letters and the responses, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Plaintiff is directed to respond to DE 10 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by May 28, 2021. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/14/2021. (Johnston, Linda) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for pre motion conference re: Motion to Remand by North Sea Associates, LLC-The Hamptons Center. (Lipsius, Ira) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER denying #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The motion to consolidate cases is denied without prejudice to renewal until after (1) the filing of a notice of appearance in the case by defendants; and (2) plaintiff's counsel conducts a meet and confer with defense counsel regarding the application to consolidate cases in an effort to seek and procure the consent of defendants to consolidation of the cases. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/13/2021. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. by Oriska Corporation (Policelli, Frank) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum, #3 #1 Attachment to Memorandum-JPML Motion, #4 #2 Attachment to Memorandum-Schedule of Actions, #5 #3 Attachment to Memorandum-Brief to Panel, #6 #4- Judge Libert Order) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge (Kernan, James) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Bent Philipson, Benjamin Landa, Benjamin Fishoff, Ruth Hirsch, Pinchus Hoffman, Ronald Stern, Aaron Brecher, Alan Chopp, Eric Kalt, Jacob Pollack, Mayer Fiscl, Robert Kolman, Israel Pollack, Jeffrey Goldstein, Michael Pruzansky, The Philipson Family Trust, The Pitterman Family Trust, The Schlesinger Family Trust, Berkshire Group, Inc., Spencer Street Realty, Allstate ASO, Inc., Allstate Administrators, Inc., Sam Schlesinger, Michael Camilleri, Wolf Eisenbach, National Financial Service, Financial Service, Michael Schweimmer, Martin Schwartzman, Grandview Brokerage, Inc., Isaac Muller, Broad Coverage Services, Inc., SentosaCare, LLC, Israel Ziegelman, Stella M. Vilardi, Raphael A. Weitzner, Benjamin Landa, Ira Lipsius, Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP, Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP, Cullen & Dykman LLP, John Doe, Andrew Cuomo, Linda Lacewell, Roberta Reardon, Carolyn Robinson, Martha Lees, Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, State University of New York, Scott Dietrich, Peter Fountas, Howard A. Zucker, M.D., Oriska Insurance Company and Rashbi Management, Inc. added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge from Suffolk County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019-621892. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14377928) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kernan, James) Modified on 4/20/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cullen and Dykman, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP is a litigant