This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:30:39 (UTC).

Oriental Financial Services, LLC v. Lizardi Baldaguez

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Oriental Financial Services, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Lizardi Baldaguez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01348

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oriental Financial Services, LLC

Respondent

Luis Lizardi Baldaguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Eduardo Luis Hernandez-Freire

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez, LLC

1001 San Roberto Street, Monacillos Ward

San Juan, PR 00927

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado Fernandez LLC

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Summons Executed Waiver of Service of Summons

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

#3

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Category Sheet

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Oriental Financial Services, LLC. Luis Lizardi Baldaguez waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Waiver of Service of Summons) (Hernandez-Freire, Eduardo) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Luis Lizardi Baldaguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services, LLC (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Compliance and Enforce Subpoena Issued by a Panel of Arbitrators of the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority against Luis Lizardi Baldaguez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6953256.), filed by Oriental Financial Services, LLC. Service due by 10/15/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet, #9 Summons)(Hernandez-Freire, Eduardo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Financial Services Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez