This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 08:40:37 (UTC).

Oriental Financial Services Corp. v. Betancourt-Figueroa et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Oriental Financial Services Corp filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Betancourt-Figueroa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01191

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oriental Financial Services Corp.

Defendants

Mariano Betancourt Figueroa

Cristina Quiles Santos

Respondents

Cristina Quiles-Santos

Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Pedro Hernandez-Freire

P.O. Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado Fernandez LLC

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Respondent Attorney

Winston Vidal-Gambaro

Attorney at Winston Vidal Law Office

Po Box 193673

San Juan, PR 00919-3673

 

Court Documents

#8

7 #1

Exhibit AWARD

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Category Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit E(cont.)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit Declaration in Support

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. 7 filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp. Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa, Cristina Quiles-Santos filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp.. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa, Cristina Quiles-Santos filed by Winston Vidal-Gambaro on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AWARD)(Vidal-Gambaro, Winston) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Winston Vidal-Gambaro on behalf of All Defendants (Vidal-Gambaro, Winston) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices, Orders, Pleadings and Documents by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services Corp. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Mariano Betancourt Figueroa, Cristina Quiles Santos (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6865764.), filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp.. Service due by 7/22/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E(cont.), #8 Category Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hernandez-Freire, Pedro) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Financial Services Corp is a litigant