This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:23:25 (UTC).

Oriental Bank v. Matthew et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Oriental Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Matthew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oriental Bank

255 S. Orange Ave, 255 S. Orange Ave, 900

Orlando, FL 32822

Defendants

Marvin L Matthew

U.S. Small Business Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Reinhardt

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

1000 Blackbeard'S Hill Suite 10

St Thomas, VA 00802

Defendant Attorney

Angela Tyson-Floyd

Attorney at Department of Justice

1108 King Street, Suite 201

St Croix, VA 00820

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Tyson-Floyd on behalf of Defendant U.S. Small Business Administration (Tyson-Floyd, Angela) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons. (TNS) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Marvin L Matthew. (TNS) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to U.S. Small Business Administration, Gretchen C.F. Shappert, USA. (TNS) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to U.S. Small Business Administration. (TNS) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to U.S. Small Business Administration, Attorney General of the United States-Merrick Garland. (TNS) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Oriental Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Reinhardt, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-940412.)filed by Oriental Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reinhardt, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Tyson-Floyd