This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2021 at 08:24:41 (UTC).

Oriental Bank v. Brown et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Oriental Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00266

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oriental Bank

5404 Cypress Center Dr., Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Mary C Brown

St.Thomas, VA 00801

U.S. Small Business Administration

1108 King St, Suite 201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Casey Payton

Attorney at Legal Services of the Virgin Islands, Inc.

1832 Kongens Gade

St. Thomas, VA 00802

Angela Tyson-Floyd

Attorney at Department of Justice

1108 King Street, Suite 201

St Croix, VA 00820

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#17

16 #1

Request for Confidential Position Papers

#16

#15

#14

#8

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A- Superior Court Complaint

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from U.S. Small Business Administration by Defendant Mary C Brown. (Payton, Casey) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re: #8 Hard Copy Notice of filing (TNS) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Harrington, Johanna) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER (RM): Mediation Conference set for October 4, 2021 at 01:00 PM via Microsoft Teams before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Order Requesting Confidential Mediation Conference Position Papers). Teams information shall be provided via email. (AO) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S RULE 26 SELF-EXECUTING INITIAL DISCLOSURES by U.S. Small Business Administration (Tyson-Floyd, Angela) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER:(GWC) dated 8/27/21. Status Conference set for 10/12/2021 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon Jr.; Initial Disclosures due on or before 9/13/2021; Discovery Memo due on or before 10/6/2021.(GPG) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.(GWC) dated 8/27/21 (GPG) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr.: Status Conference held on 8/27/2021. (Court Reporter N/A.) (GPG) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER (WAL) dated 8/26/2021 Referring Case To Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (TNS) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Oriental Bank. (Harrington, Johanna) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Fed R Civ P 26 Disclosures by Oriental Bank (Harrington, Johanna) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) HARD COPY NOTICE of filing Related Document: #4 via certified mail to Mary C. Brown, P.O. Box 10879, St. Thomas, VI 00801 (TNS) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: the document name and event does not match. Re: #7 Request for Production of Documents. (W, K) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Defendant Mary C Brown. (Payton, Casey) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Payton on behalf of Defendant Mary C Brown (Payton, Casey) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oriental Bank. (Harrington, Johanna) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (GWC) dated 8/13/2021 setting telephonic status conference for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) United States on behalf of U.S. Small Business Administration ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Tyson-Floyd, Angela) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Notice of Filing Other Superior Court Documents by U.S. Small Business Administration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants U.S. Small Business Administration, Mary C Brown, Plaintiff Oriental Bank from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number SX-2021-CV-00092. filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Superior Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Tyson-Floyd