This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2022 at 07:46:03 (UTC).

Orellano-Laureano v. Instituto Medico del Norte et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 Orellano-Laureano filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Instituto Medico del Norte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01322

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elsie A. Orellano-Laureano

Defendants

Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. doing business as Hospital Wilma N. Vazquez

Company ABC

Insurance Company XYZ

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios

Attorney at Victor M. Rivera-Rios

1420 Fernandez Juncos Ave.

San Juan, PR 00909

Defendant Attorneys

Jan Carlos Bonilla-Silva

Attorney at Metro Office Park

Street 1, Building 11, Suite 105A

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Heriberto Lopez-Guzman

Attorney at H. Lopez Law

Building 11, Street 1, Suite 105A

Guaynabo, PR 00968

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsie A. Orellano-Laureano upon Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31 2022 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Jan Carlos Bonilla-Silva on behalf of Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bonilla-Silva, Jan) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re: #7 "Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiff may respond not later than September 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/23/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. Responses due by 9/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Granting #5 "Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead not later than August 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/3/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31 2022 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Jan Carlos Bonilla-Silva on behalf of Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. Responses due by 8/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bonilla-Silva, Jan) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsie A. Orellano-Laureano upon Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Instituto Medico del Norte, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7821249.), filed by Elsie A Orellano-Laureano. Service due by 10/4/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heriberto Lopez-Guzman