Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 07:54:57 (UTC).

Oregon Catholic Press v. Ambrosetti

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Oregon Catholic Press filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ambrosetti. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oregon Catholic Press

Defendant

Vincent A. Ambrosetti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leonard D. DuBoff

Attorney at The DuBoff Law Group, LLC

6665 Sw Hampton Street, Suite 200

Portland, OR 97223-8357

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick

Attorney at IdeaLegal

2240 N Interstate Ave., Suite 270

Portland, OR 97227

Donald J. Schmid

Attorney at Law Offices of Donald J. Schmid

1251 N. Eddy St., Suite 200

South Bend, IN 46617

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald J. Schmid for Vincent A. Ambrosetti. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6062897 issued. Signed on 10/31/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#11

(#11) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald J. Schmid . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062897. Filed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick appearing on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti Filed by on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Unavailability of Leonard DuBoff Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti waiver sent on 9/10/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vincent A. Ambrosetti. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Vincent Ambrosetti on 09/03/19 by Oregon Catholic Press. Waiver of Service is due by 10/3/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5985239 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: PA0000525379--I Will Sing--Pauline Krystal Music & International Liturgy Publications. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press against Vince Ambrosetti. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • (#13) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Donald J. Schmid (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: djschmid. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald J. Schmid for Vincent A. Ambrosetti. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6062897 issued. Signed on 10/31/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald J. Schmid . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062897. Filed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick appearing on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti Filed by on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Unavailability of Leonard DuBoff Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti waiver sent on 9/10/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vincent A. Ambrosetti. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Vincent Ambrosetti on 09/03/19 by Oregon Catholic Press. Waiver of Service is due by 10/3/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5985239 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: PA0000525379--I Will Sing--Pauline Krystal Music & International Liturgy Publications. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press against Vince Ambrosetti. (DuBoff, Leonard) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard D. DuBoff