This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2021 at 10:35:48 (UTC).

Gauthier, et al v. Vitro Electric, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Gauthier filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Vitro Electric, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jolie A. Russo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jolie A. Russo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Garth Bachman

Timothy J. Gauthier

Defendants

John Vitro

Vitro Electric, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs of Motion for Entry of Default #6 and Declaration Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) Declaration of Dylan P. Jensen . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#6

(#6) Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Vitro Electric, LLC served on 2/1/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon John Vitro served on 2/1/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to John Vitro, Vitro Electric, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (kgc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Vitro Electric, LLC

1 #2

Proposed Summons John Vitro, individually

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808904 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons John Vitro, individually, #3 Proposed Summons Vitro Electric, LLC). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default #6 as to Defendants Vitro Electric, LLC and John Vitro. Within 30 days, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment along with a proposed form of default judgment for review by a U.S. District Judge. (gm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs of Motion for Entry of Default #6 and Declaration Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Dylan P. Jensen . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Vitro Electric, LLC served on 2/1/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon John Vitro served on 2/1/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to John Vitro, Vitro Electric, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (kgc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808904 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons John Vitro, individually, #3 Proposed Summons Vitro Electric, LLC). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitro Electric LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin