This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2020 at 19:24:53 (UTC).

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee v. Vitro Electric LLC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Vitro Electric LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna J. Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01279

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna J. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Defendant

Vitro Electric LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed on 12/12/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Second Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5963547 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed on 12/12/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#8) Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges Plaintiffs Second Status Report [#7]. Plaintiffs dismissal or a stipulated judgment is due no later than 12/16/19. (bb) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docket(#6) Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges Plaintiffs Status Report [#5] filed 11/12/19. The Court directs Plaintiff to file an updated status report no later than 11/25/19. (bb) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5963547 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitro Electric LLC is a litigant