This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 18:45:32 (UTC).

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee et al v. Vitro Electric LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Vitro Electric LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marco A. Hernandez and Youlee Yim You. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Marco A. Hernandez

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garth Bachman

Timothy J. Gauthier

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Defendants

John Vitro

Vitro Electric LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Summons Amended

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of Linda J. Larkin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #10 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Vitro Electric LLC served on 5/5/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Complaint . Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee, Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman against Vitro Electric LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon John Vitro served on 4/16/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Vitro Electric LLC served on 4/16/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to John Vitro, Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6520503 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee, Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitro Electric LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin