This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2019 at 07:55:03 (UTC).

Oregon and Southwest Washington IBEW-NECA Electrical Workers Audit Committee v. Crown Voltage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Oregon and Southwest Washington IBEW-NECA Electrical Workers Audit Committee filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Crown Voltage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01177

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oregon and Southwest Washington IBEW-NECA Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Timothy J. Gauthier

Garth Bachman

Defendants

Stacy LaCombe

Washougal, WA 98671

Daniel Tucker

Vancouver, WA 98664

Crown Voltage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Notice re Summons Issued #4 Office Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Summons Issued #4 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Stacy LaCombe. (jn) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Daniel Tucker. (jn) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 8/25/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 8/8/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons 3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5943209 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington IBEW-NECA Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons 3). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice re Summons Issued #4 Office Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Summons Issued #4 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Stacy LaCombe. (jn) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Daniel Tucker. (jn) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 8/25/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 8/8/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5943209 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington IBEW-NECA Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons 3). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin