This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:09:26 (UTC).

Ordonez v. Mental Health Treatment Center

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Ordonez filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Mental Health Treatment Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea and James O. Browning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00927

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremiah Ordonez

Los Lunas, NM 87301

Defendant

Mental Health Treatment Center

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea by District Judge James O. Browning (vv) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremiah Ordonez. (nr) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Cure Defects by October 19, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Jeremiah Ordonez (bap) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#1

(#1) 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Mental Health Treatment Center, filed by Jeremiah Ordonez. (ln) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea by District Judge James O. Browning (vv) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremiah Ordonez. (nr) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to Cure Defects by October 19, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Jeremiah Ordonez (bap) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketUnited States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Mental Health Treatment Center, filed by Jeremiah Ordonez. (ln) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less