This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:25:39 (UTC).

Orbit Licensing LLC v. Wowza Media System, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Orbit Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wowza Media System, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00953

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orbit Licensing LLC

Defendant

Wowza Media System, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orbit Licensing LLC. Wowza Media System, LLC served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,497,035 ;9,578,040. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Wowza Media System, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647145.) - filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/21. (ntl) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orbit Licensing LLC. Wowza Media System, LLC served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00938-LPS, 1:21-cv-00943-LPS, 1:21-cv-00948-LPS, 1:21-cv-00949-LPS, 1:21-cv-00953-LPS, 1:21-cv-00962-LPS and 1:21-cv-00964-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,497,035 ;9,578,040. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Wowza Media System, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647145.) - filed by Orbit Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orbit Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Coffee Cup Partners, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin