This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 08:34:30 (UTC).

OrangeHook, Inc. et al v. ReMy Health, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 OrangeHook, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ReMy Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Paul A. Magnuson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01935

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Magnuson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LifeMed ID, Inc.

OrangeHook, Inc.

Defendant

ReMy Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aklilu D Dunlap

Attorney at Dunlap Law Office

3033 Excelsior Blvd Ste 100

Mpls, MN 55416

Defendant Attorney

Matthew D. Callanan

Attorney at Belin McCormick, PC

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #2

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

5 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 6. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/30/2020 unless further timely submissions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/29/2020. (EB) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING filed by LifeMed ID, Inc.. (Dunlap, Aklilu) Modified text on 10/29/2020 (kt). (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #6 Exhibit A filed by ReMy Health, Inc.. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER in re dispositive motion practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 9/24/2020. (LLM) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/21/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ReMy Health, Inc..(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #3 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ReMy Health, Inc..(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit A re #5 Brief filed by ReMy Health, Inc..(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ReMy Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ReMy Health, Inc.. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1935 PAM/TNL. (kt) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-cv-20-7330 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8048535) filed by ReMy Health, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew David Callanan