This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 07:38:25 (UTC).

Oracle Corporation v. Vilox Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Oracle Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vilox Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oracle Corporation

Defendant

Vilox Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Egan

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Jared Bobrow

Diana M. Rutowski

Jason K. Yu

Kristina D. McKenna

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit 3

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#5

(#5) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,188,100 B2; 6,760,720 B2. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Oracle Corporation. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Vilox Technologies, LLC on 2/2/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit 1 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/2/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#9

(#9) REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint by Oracle Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Oracle Corporation: For Vilox Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Diana M. Rutowski, Jason Yu and Kristina D. McKenna - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Related Actions by Oracle Corporation (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Related Actions by Oracle Corporation (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Kristina D. McKenna, Jason K. Yu, Diana M. Rutowski, and Jared Bobrow for Oracle Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Diana M. Rutowski, Jason Yu and Kristina D. McKenna filed by Oracle Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/9/2023. (dlw) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Diana M. Rutowski, Jason Yu and Kristina D. McKenna - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Oracle Corporation: For Vilox Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint by Oracle Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit 1 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/2/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge, MN. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Vilox Technologies, LLC on 2/2/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Oracle Corporation. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,188,100 B2; 6,760,720 B2. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) EXHIBITS 2 and 3 to D.I. #2 SEALED Complaint filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Vilox Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4058136.) - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit 1 Under Seal - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mkr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less