This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2021 at 07:57:44 (UTC).

Optinetix Inc. v. Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Optinetix Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Jo-Ann Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Optinetix Inc.

Defendant

Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Anderson

Attorney at Budo Law PC - CO

5610 Ward Rd, Suite 300

Arvada, CO 80002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for serivce as to Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Change Venue to Tyler Division by Optinetix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 07/31/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing plaintiff, within 30 days, to serve the defendant pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/21/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optinetix Inc. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Jo-Ann Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8440959.), filed by Optinetix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for serivce as to Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Change Venue to Tyler Division by Optinetix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 07/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing plaintiff, within 30 days, to serve the defendant pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/21/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Optinetix Inc.. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optinetix Inc. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Jo-Ann Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8440959.), filed by Optinetix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Optinetix Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jo-Ann Stores, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirk Anderson