This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 07:53:23 (UTC).

Optima Direct, LLC v. Idaptive,LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Optima Direct, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Idaptive,LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02336

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Optima Direct, LLC

Defendant

Idaptive,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Dominick T. Gattuso

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to February 21, 2020 - filed by Idaptive,LLC. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Idaptive,LLC (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,646,060. (myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Idaptive,LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2808666.) - filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to February 21, 2020 filed by Idaptive,LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/21/20. (ntl) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to February 21, 2020 - filed by Idaptive,LLC. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Idaptive,LLC (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02336-LPS, 1:19-cv-02337-LPS, 1:19-cv-02339-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Idaptive,LLC on 12/23/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,646,060. (myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Idaptive,LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2808666.) - filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Optima Direct, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominick T. Gattuso