This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2019 at 07:01:24 (UTC).

Opticurrent, LLC v. Power Integrations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Opticurrent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Power Integrations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03563

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Opticurrent, LLC

Defendant

Power Integrations, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis Emery Hudnell, III

Attorney at Hudnell Law Group PC

800 W. El Camino Real, Suite 180

Mountain View, CA 94040

Jonathan T. Suder

Attorney at Friedman Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 is vacated and RESCHEDULED for 11/7/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suder, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/18/2019) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 3:17-cv-3597-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/27/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

10 #1

complaint

#10

(#10) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Power Integrations, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#8

(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Opticurrent, LLC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Opticurrent, LLC (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Power Integrations, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13452117.). Filed byOpticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 is vacated and RESCHEDULED for 11/7/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suder, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/18/2019) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 3:17-cv-3597-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/27/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Power Integrations, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Opticurrent, LLC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Opticurrent, LLC (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Power Integrations, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13452117.). Filed byOpticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTICURRENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan T Suder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis Emery Hudnell, III