Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 07:48:34 (UTC).

Opticurrent, LLC v. On Semiconductor Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Opticurrent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against On Semiconductor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01425

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Opticurrent, LLC

Defendant

On Semiconductor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis Emery Hudnell, III

Attorney at Hudnell Law Group PC

800 W. El Camino Real, Suite 180

Mountain View, CA 94040

Corby R. Vowell

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke, PC

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Dave Ross Gunter

Attorney at Friedman Suder Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jonathan T. Suder

Attorney at Friedman Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Nai-Shu Kang

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

34Th Fl., 101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Robert Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Matthew R. McCullough

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Katherine Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #29 Stipulation filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. Response due 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

#30

(#30) Certificate of Interested Entities by On Semiconductor Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Power Integrations, Inc., Other Affiliate Mouser Electronics, Inc. for On Semiconductor Corporation. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#29

(#29) STIPULATION for Extending Time for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation to Respond to Complaint #1 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#28

(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement by On Semiconductor Corporation and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nai-Shu Kang for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation (Kang, Robert) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McCullough for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation (McCullough, Matthew) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638687.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

8 #1

Supplement

#8

(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638677.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

7 #1

Supplement

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638653.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Opticurrent, LLC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#29) STIPULATION for Extending Time for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation to Respond to Complaint #1 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #29 Stipulation filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. Response due 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Certificate of Interested Entities by On Semiconductor Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Power Integrations, Inc., Other Affiliate Mouser Electronics, Inc. for On Semiconductor Corporation. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #28 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by On Semiconductor Corporation (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION for Extending Time for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation to Respond to Complaint #1 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement by On Semiconductor Corporation and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nai-Shu Kang for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation (Kang, Robert) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McCullough for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation (McCullough, Matthew) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Rueckheim for ON Semiconductor Corporation (Rueckheim, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Vidal for Defendant ON Semiconductor Corporation (Vidal, Katherine) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Opticurrent, LLC. On Semiconductor Corporation served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Suder, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638687.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638677.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15638653.) filed by Opticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Opticurrent, LLC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against On Semiconductor Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15630127.). Filed byOpticurrent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTICURRENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where On Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R McCullough

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Vidal