This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:16:00 (UTC).

Optical Licensing LLC v. TTM Technologies North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Optical Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TTM Technologies North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01858

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Optical Licensing LLC

Defendant

TTM Technologies North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US6791898

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

#2

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon TTM Technologies North America, LLC on 10/21/2021, filed on behalf of Optical Licensing LLC. (D,Th) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/13/2021 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Optical Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon TTM Technologies North America, LLC on 10/21/2021, filed on behalf of Optical Licensing LLC. (D,Th) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons, Complaint and Magistrate Consent Form addressed to TTM Technologies North America, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company (7020 0090 0001 4429 1995) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (G,M) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon TTM Technologies North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,M) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (G,M) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (G,M) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Optical Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Optical Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against TTM Technologies North America, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11059789. Filed by Optical Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6791898, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Optical Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow