This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 08:33:08 (UTC).

Optical Licensing LLC v. Abacus Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Optical Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Abacus Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Optical Licensing LLC

Defendant

Abacus Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand & Sebolt

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 05/10/2021 by Optical Licensing LLC as to Abacus Industries, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/28/2021. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Abacus Industries, Inc.. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Optical Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A-US6791898

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Abacus Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18188090) filed by Optical Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6791898, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 05/10/2021 by Optical Licensing LLC as to Abacus Industries, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/28/2021. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Abacus Industries, Inc.. (MLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0347-JLB-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Optical Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abacus Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18188090) filed by Optical Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6791898, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Optical Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow