This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 11:24:54 (UTC).

Oppenheim v. Dentsu America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Oppenheim filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dentsu America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-08346

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laurent Oppenheim

Defendants

Amplifius, LLC

Dentsu America, Inc.

Carat USA, Inc.

Amnet Group, Inc.

Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Shane Dennis Howarter

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Chantelle Cappa Egan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jaclyn A Gross

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) Receipt from San Francisco County Superior Court acknowledging receipt of remand documents. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#31

(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding case to San Francisco County Superior Court. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#30

(#30) ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #24 Motion to Remand; denying as moot #11 Motion to Compel. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

24 #3

Proposed Order

24 #2

Declaration of Yosef Peretz

24 #1

Declaration of Laurent Oppenheim

#24

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #1

Declaration of Robert Hannan

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Receipt from San Francisco County Superior Court acknowledging receipt of remand documents. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding case to San Francisco County Superior Court. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #24 Motion to Remand; denying as moot #11 Motion to Compel. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court has determined that Motions #11 , #24 are suitable for resolution without oral argument in accordance with L.R. 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 2/18/21 hearing is vacated and the Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing set for 2/4/2021 re Motions #11 and #24 is rescheduled to 2/18/2021 at 1:30pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Remand ) filed by Laurent Oppenheim. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yosef Peretz)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 1/14/2021) Modified on 1/15/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAmnet Group, Inc., Amplifius, LLC, Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jamie Barash, #2 Declaration of Lucas Cridland, #3 Declaration of Jaclyn A. Gross, #4 Declaration of Jacqueline Hazlitt)(Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Response ( Non Motion ) Corrected by Clerk (no ac tion is necessary) Re: #25 Brief, filed by Laurent Oppenheim (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Response ( Non Motion ) re #23 Joinder Response to Defendant Amplifi, Inc.'s Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Civil Proceedings filed by Laurent Oppenheim. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurent Oppenheim)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Remand filed by Laurent Oppenheim. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/7/2021. Replies due by 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurent Oppenheim, #2 Declaration of Yosef Peretz, #3 Proposed Order)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 12/24/2020) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amnet Group, Inc., Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Holdings USA, LLC for Dentsu America, Inc.; Corporate Parent Aegis GPS Holdings, Ltd. for Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Eaton Gate, LLC for Amnet Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Aegis Media Americas, LLC for Carat USA, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amnet Group, Inc., Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc. re #6 Notice of Appearance of Chantelle C. Egan (Egan, Chantelle) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Carat USA, Inc., Amnet Group, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., and Re: #3 (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) Modified on 11/30/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chantelle Cappa Egan (Egan, Chantelle) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amnet Group, Inc., Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (and all supporting documents) (Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amnet Group, Inc., Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Holdings USA, LLC for Dentsu America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amnet Group, Inc., Carat USA, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Holdings USA, LLC for Dentsu America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-586994. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15242873). Filed by Amnet Group, Inc., Dentsu Aegis Network US Holdings, Inc., Dentsu America, Inc., Carat USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified on 11/30/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARAT USA INC. is a litigant