This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 09:13:12 (UTC).

Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund et al v. VCNA Prairie, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Operating Engineers Local 965 Health Benefit Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against VCNA Prairie, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03153

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965 Annuity Fund

Operating Engineers Local 965 Apprentice Training and Retraining Fund

Downstate Infrastructure Awareness and Advancement Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund

Associated General Contractors of Illinois Industry Advancement Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965

Defendant

VCNA Prairie, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P Leahy

Attorney at CAVANAGH & O'HARA LLP

2319 West Jefferson

Springfield, IL 62702

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Associated General Contractors of Illinois Industry Advancement Fund, Downstate Infrastructure Awareness and Advancement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965 Annuity Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund, Operating Engineers Local 965 Apprentice Training and Retraining Fund. (Leahy, John) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965, Associated General Contractors of Illinois Industry Advancement Fund, Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund, Downstate Infrastructure Awareness and Advancement Fund, Operating Engineers Local 965 Apprentice Training and Retraining Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965 Annuity Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund. VCNA Prairie, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Leahy, John) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to VCNA Prairie, LLC and original with court sealed returned to Plaintiff's attorney via U.S. mail. (ME) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Docket Text or Event Modification re [1-11] Summons, [1-12] Civil Cover Sheet: Document replaced with proper adobe format. Documents were filed in fillable format. (ME) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Associated General Contractors of Illinois Industry Advancement Fund, Downstate Infrastructure Awareness and Advancement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965 Annuity Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund, Operating Engineers Local 965 Apprentice Training and Retraining Fund. (Leahy, John) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VCNA Prairie, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3708623.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965, Associated General Contractors of Illinois Industry Advancement Fund, Operating Engineers Local #965 Health Benefit Fund, Downstate Infrastructure Awareness and Advancement Fund, Operating Engineers Local 965 Apprentice Training and Retraining Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 965 Annuity Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Summons, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leahy, John) (Attachment 12 replaced on 7/15/2021) (ME). (Attachment 11 replaced on 7/15/2021) (ME). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers 965 Political Education Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers National Training Fund is a litigant