This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:44:54 (UTC).

Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund et al v. McGuire, Inc

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against McGuire, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund

Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers

Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund

Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund

Terrance E McGowan

Joseph Shelton

International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139

Defendants

McGuire, Inc

McGuire Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia L Buchko

Attorney at Construction Business Group

4702 S Biltmore Ln

Madison, WI 53718

Laura M Finnegan

Attorney at Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman Ltd

200 W Adams St - Ste 2200

Chicago, IL 60606-5231

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Buchko, Cynthia)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McGuire Inc served on 1/31/2022. (Buchko, Cynthia)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139, Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund, Terrance E McGowan, Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund, Joseph Shelton, Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund. (Buchko, Cynthia)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Terminated pursuant to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (amb) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139, Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund, Terrance E McGowan, Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund, Joseph Shelton, Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund. (Buchko, Cynthia)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McGuire Inc served on 1/31/2022. (Buchko, Cynthia)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to McGuire Inc. (amb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Buchko, Cynthia)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Buchko, Cynthia)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against McGuire, Inc by Joseph Shelton, Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund, Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund, Terrance E McGowan. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4016781) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Buchko, Cynthia)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less