This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:44:03 (UTC).

Open Society Justice Initiative v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Open Society Justice Initiative filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Office of the Director of National Intelligence. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06625

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Open Society Justice Initiative

Defendant

Office of the Director of National Intelligence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine M. Amirfar

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Amrit Singh

Attorney at Open Society Justice Initiative

224 W. 57Th St

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Max Aronoff

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the SDNY

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Natasha Waglow Teleanu

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

86 Chambers Street, 3Rd Fl.

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: The Court has received the Complaint in this matter and has determined that it is related to the FOIA litigation pending before the Court in Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency, et al., No. 19 Civ. 234 (PAE) (BCM). To assure the efficient and coordinated litigation of these matters, the Court directs counsel to promptly meet and confer, and to submit a joint letter by September 3, 2020, setting out the parties' views as to a plan for the prompt adjudication of the claims in the newly filed case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/21/2020) (cf) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to three weeks after the date of the Court's decision on the forthcoming cross-motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/17/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#14

(#14) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, until after motions are resolved, if necessary addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 9/16/2020. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The Court adopts the schedule proposed by the Government, under which ODNI would respond to plaintiffs' request by October 9. The Court adopts the following schedule for summary judgment briefing: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due November 9, 2020; Plaintiff will file its motion for summary judgment and its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by December 9, 2020; Defendant will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion, and its opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion, by December 23, 2020. Plaintiff will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion by January 6, 2021. Motions due by 12/9/2020. Responses due by 12/23/2020 Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/9/2020) (nb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#12

(#12) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu and Catherine Amirfar dated 9/3/2020 re: the parties' views on consolidation, the response to the FOIA request, and scheduling. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Singh, Amrit) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahern for personal service. Registered Mailings were also completed on 8/20/20.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - 7/22/20 FOIA Request Acknowledgment

1 #2

Exhibit B - 7/20/20 FOIA Request

1 #1

Exhibit A - 2/27/20 Schiff letter to Director Grenell

#1

(#14) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, until after motions are resolved, if necessary addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 9/16/2020. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to three weeks after the date of the Court's decision on the forthcoming cross-motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/17/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, until after motions are resolved, if necessary addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 9/16/2020. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The Court adopts the schedule proposed by the Government, under which ODNI would respond to plaintiffs' request by October 9. The Court adopts the following schedule for summary judgment briefing: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due November 9, 2020; Plaintiff will file its motion for summary judgment and its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by December 9, 2020; Defendant will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion, and its opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion, by December 23, 2020. Plaintiff will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion by January 6, 2021. Motions due by 12/9/2020. Responses due by 12/23/2020 Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/9/2020) (nb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu and Catherine Amirfar dated 9/3/2020 re: the parties' views on consolidation, the response to the FOIA request, and scheduling. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Singh, Amrit) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahern for personal service. Registered Mailings were also completed on 8/20/20.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The Court has received the Complaint in this matter and has determined that it is related to the FOIA litigation pending before the Court in Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency, et al., No. 19 Civ. 234 (PAE) (BCM). To assure the efficient and coordinated litigation of these matters, the Court directs counsel to promptly meet and confer, and to submit a joint letter by September 3, 2020, setting out the parties' views as to a plan for the prompt adjudication of the claims in the newly filed case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/21/2020) (cf) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 19CV234. (pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-234-PAE. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21227730)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2/27/20 Schiff letter to Director Grenell, #2 Exhibit B - 7/20/20 FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit C - 7/22/20 FOIA Request Acknowledgment).(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less