This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:06:56 (UTC).

Ootsey v. Grasser

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Ootsey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Grasser. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00853

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Ootsey

Defendant

Savannah Grasser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Painter Roberts

Attorney at Scott H. Palmer, PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540, Lb36

Addison, TX 75001

Scott H Palmer

Attorney at Scott H. Palmer, PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540, Lb36

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorney

Robert Jacob Davis

Attorney at Matthews Shiels Knott Eden Davis & Beanland LLP - Dallas

8131 Lbj Freeway, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75251

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Ootsey. Savannah Grasser served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Savannah Grasser.( Davis, Robert) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/9/2021 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Savannah Grasser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mediation Confirmation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit Mediation Confirmation

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond shall be Friday, February 25, 2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/13/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Savannah Grasser to 2/25/2022. (mcg) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond shall be Friday, February 25, 2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/13/2021. (mcg) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Savannah Grasser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mediation Confirmation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Savannah Grasser to 12/17/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mcg) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Savannah Grasser.( Davis, Robert) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/9/2021 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Ootsey. Savannah Grasser served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Savannah Grasser. (mcg) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Palmer on behalf of Angela Ootsey (Palmer, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document:. Certificate of Interested Persons (Roberts, James) Modified text on 10/25/2021 (mcg). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Savannah Grasser ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8639586.), filed by Angela Ootsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Jacob Davis