This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2020 at 20:33:23 (UTC).

Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. v. Merck and Company, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 Ono Pharmaceutical Co , Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Merck and Company, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08006

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

Defendant

Merck and Company, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Marcelo Marlow Blackburn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Mark Edward Rizik

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Frank Samuel Restagno

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Allan Paul Victor

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorney

Phoebe Anne Wilkinson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC)

390 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. In light of the Court's October 15, 2019 Order, filed under seal, the Court will adjourn sine die the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for November 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/15/2019) (mml) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#17

(#17) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial Pretrial Conference), addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated October 11, 2019. Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#16

(#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Merck Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent MSD Corp., Corporate Parent Merck & Co, Inc. for Merck and Company, Incorporated. Document filed by Merck and Company, Incorporated.(Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/23/2019) (rro) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/16/2019) (js) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#13

(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Merck's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Phoebe A. Wilkinson dated September 16, 2019. Document filed by Merck and Company, Incorporated.(Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phoebe Anne Wilkinson on behalf of Merck and Company, Incorporated. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Samuel Restagno on behalf of Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Restagno, Frank) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Seal entered 8/29/2019 served on Merck and Company, Incorporated on 8/29/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent (The Corporation Trust Co.). Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent (The Corporation Trust Co.). Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ono is authorized to file the Complaint under seal. Any declaration by Merck to support maintaining the Complaint under seal must be served and filed within fourteen days after service of this Order upon Merck, together with proposed redactions of the specific portions of the Complaint that Merck deems to be sealable and seeks to maintain under seal. If no such declaration is served and filed by Merck within fourteen days as described, the Complaint shall be filed thereafter publicly and unredacted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/27/2019) (ama) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

(#2) DOCUMENTS TO BE SEALED (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/27/2019) (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • (#20) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#19) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. In light of the Court's October 15, 2019 Order, filed under seal, the Court will adjourn sine die the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for November 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/15/2019) (mml) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial Pretrial Conference), addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated October 11, 2019. Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Merck Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent MSD Corp., Corporate Parent Merck & Co, Inc. for Merck and Company, Incorporated. Document filed by Merck and Company, Incorporated.(Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/23/2019) (rro) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/16/2019) (js) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Merck's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Phoebe A. Wilkinson dated September 16, 2019. Document filed by Merck and Company, Incorporated.(Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phoebe Anne Wilkinson on behalf of Merck and Company, Incorporated. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Samuel Restagno on behalf of Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Restagno, Frank) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Seal entered 8/29/2019 served on Merck and Company, Incorporated on 8/29/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent (The Corporation Trust Co.). Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent (The Corporation Trust Co.). Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO SEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ono is authorized to file the Complaint under seal. Any declaration by Merck to support maintaining the Complaint under seal must be served and filed within fourteen days after service of this Order upon Merck, together with proposed redactions of the specific portions of the Complaint that Merck deems to be sealable and seeks to maintain under seal. If no such declaration is served and filed by Merck within fourteen days as described, the Complaint shall be filed thereafter publicly and unredacted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/27/2019) (ama) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#4) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCUMENTS TO BE SEALED (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/27/2019) (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merck and Company, Incorporated. (pc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phoebe A. Wilkinson