This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 08:14:11 (UTC).

Onn v. Carnival Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Onn filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Carnival Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-07929

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Onn

Defendants

Mouseflow, Inc.

Carnival Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Dashiell Smith

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Anahit Tagvoryan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Julianna Simon

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Nicole Mikiko Tadano

Attorney at Orrick

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Aravind Swaminathan

Attorney at Orrick

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15420077.) filed by Carnival Corp.. (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#21

(#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15419573.) filed by Carnival Corp.. (Tadano, Nicole) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#20

(#20) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. DEFENDANT MOUSEFLOW, INC.S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Simon NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW, INC. (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT MOUSEFLOW, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Anahit Tagvoryan , Harrison Brown and Julianna Simon of Blank Rome LLP on Behalf of Defendant MouseFlow, Inc. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#9

(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Onn. Carnival Corp. served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Marcus Heath (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Onn.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corp., Mouseflow, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15420077.) filed by Carnival Corp.. (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15419573.) filed by Carnival Corp.. (Tadano, Nicole) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. DEFENDANT MOUSEFLOW, INC.S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Simon NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW, INC. (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT MOUSEFLOW, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Anahit Tagvoryan , Harrison Brown and Julianna Simon of Blank Rome LLP on Behalf of Defendant MouseFlow, Inc. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION [JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEF CARNIVAL TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT] filed by Carnival Corp.. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Onn. Mouseflow, Inc. served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Onn. Carnival Corp. served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Marcus Heath (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Onn.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corp., Mouseflow, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carnival Corp., Mouseflow, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15177713.). Filed byDaniel Onn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouseflow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Carnival PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Dashiell Smith