This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:34:14 (UTC).

Online Merchants Guild v. Maduros

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Online Merchants Guild filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Maduros. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01952

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Online Merchants Guild

Defendant

Nicolas Maduros

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Candice L. Fields

Attorney at Candice Fields Law

520 Capitol Mall, Suite 750

Sacramento, CA 95814

Aaron K. Block, PHV

Attorney at The Block Firm LLC

1533 Barrington Court Nw

Atlanta, GA 30327

Paul S. Rafelson, PHV

Attorney at Rafelson Schick, PLLC

2255 Glades Rd, Suite 319

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorney

Michael Sapoznikow

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 94244

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/19/2020 EXTENDING defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint to 12/18/2020 and SETTING the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 12/18/2020. Parties' Responses to the Motions due by 1/29/2021. Reply Briefs due by 2/26/2021. The noticed hearing date for both motions is 3/25/2021. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#11

(#11) JOINT MOTION/STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduling of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Nicolas Maduros. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION to EXTEND Time for Defendant California Department of Tax & Fee Administration to Respond to Complaint by Nicolas Maduros. Attorney Sapoznikow, Michael added. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2020 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#9

(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/6/2020. Added attorney Aaron K. Block, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2020 ADDING attorney Paul S. Rafelson, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

7 #1

Declaration Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

6 #1

Declaration Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149705) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

5 #1

Declaration Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Paul S. Rafelson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149661) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

4 #2

VDRP

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nicolas Maduros* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Candice L. Fields* *Candice Fields Law* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 750* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Online Merchants Guild (Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #2

Rafelson Dec.

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Treasurer Ma ltr to Governor Newsom

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/19/2020 EXTENDING defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint to 12/18/2020 and SETTING the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 12/18/2020. Parties' Responses to the Motions due by 1/29/2021. Reply Briefs due by 2/26/2021. The noticed hearing date for both motions is 3/25/2021. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT MOTION/STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduling of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Nicolas Maduros. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION to EXTEND Time for Defendant California Department of Tax & Fee Administration to Respond to Complaint by Nicolas Maduros. Attorney Sapoznikow, Michael added. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2020 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/6/2020. Added attorney Aaron K. Block, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2020 ADDING attorney Paul S. Rafelson, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149705) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Paul S. Rafelson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149661) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nicolas Maduros* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Candice L. Fields* *Candice Fields Law* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 750* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Online Merchants Guild (Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nicolas Maduros by Online Merchants Guild. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9147270) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Treasurer Ma ltr to Governor Newsom, #2 Rafelson Dec., #3 Exhibit 3 - CDTFA Email to CNET, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amazon Tax Opinion, #5 Exhibit Amazon Email to Sellers, #6 Exhibit CDTFA Email 3.2018(1), #7 Exhibit CDTFA Correspondence, #8 Exhibit CDTFA Email 3.2018(2), #9 Exhibit CDTFA Email 2.2018, #10 Exhibit CDTFA Email 1.2019, #11 Freifelder Dec, #12 Rasbid Dec, #13 Kim Dec, #14 Wright Dec, #15 Norman Dec, #16 Exhibit Treasurer Ma Testimony, #17 Exhibit Wisconsin Notice, #18 Jenson Dec, #19 Exhibit Treasurer Ma ltr to Bosler)(Fields, Candice) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less