This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:14:43 (UTC).

Oneida County v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Oneida County filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Therese Wiley Dancks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01196

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oneida County

Defendants

3M Company

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.

AGC Chemicals Americas Inc

Amerex Corporation

Arkema Inc.

Archroma U.S., Inc.

BASF Corporation

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

Carrier Global Corporation

Chemdesign Products Inc.

Chemguard Inc.

Chemicals, Inc.

Clariant Corporation

Corteva, Inc.

Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.

Dupont De Nemours Inc.

Dynax Corporation

E.I. Dupont de Nemours & Company

Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick James Lanciotti

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Melville, NY 11747

Paul J. Napoli

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik

270 Munoz Rivera Avenue - Suite 201

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan David Sagalowsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP - NY Office

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Thomas J Herten

Attorney at Archer & Greiner, PC

Court Plaza South, Suite 35321 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601-7095

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 3M Company, Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by 3M Company submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond : Should the Judicial Panel on MDL decline to transfer this action, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2021. (sg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#9

(#9) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #69. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge.(amt) Modified on 11/16/2021 (amt). (Entered: 11/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:21-cv-03747, filed 11/16/2021. (see) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase transferred electronically to District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL-2873 (amt) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Docket entry #9 was modified to include the correct MDL transfer information and order.(amt) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #69. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge.(amt) Modified on 11/16/2021 (amt). (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a report on the status of the potential transfer of this case to the AFFF MDL by 11/29/2021. The 12/2/2021 Rule 16 Initial Conference and the associated deadlines are adjourned without new date at this time. The conference will be rescheduled as necessary once a decision has been issued on the MDL. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2021. (sg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond : Should the Judicial Panel on MDL decline to transfer this action, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the Judicial Panel to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2021. (sg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by 3M Company submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket***Answer due date set for 3M Company, Chemguard Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP to 11/8/2021. (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 3M Company, Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court - Oneida County, case number EFCA2021-2418 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5699918) filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard Inc., 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ds) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oneida County is a litigant

Latest cases where Archroma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerex Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant