This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2022 at 10:13:34 (UTC).

One Nation Irrevocable Trust et al v. Das et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 One Nation Irrevocable Trust filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Das. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01752

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

One Nation Irrevocable Trust

975 E. Riggs Rd Ste 12-418

Chandler, AZ 85249

Defendants

Randhir Gandhi Das

Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated

U.S. Bank National Association

Colt 2020-IR Mortgage Loan Trust doing business as Caliber Home Loans Incorporated

Millenium Title Agency LLC

First American Mortgage Solutions

MERS

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Cassie B Arntsen

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Ari Ramras

Attorney at Ramras Legal PLC

11811 N Tatum Blvd., Ste. 3031

Phoenix, AZ 85028

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT- Pursuant to the Court's order filed November 29, 2022, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (CLM) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER: Westbrook's Motion to Amend (Doc. #13 ), which the Court construes as a Motion for Reconsideration, is denied. Westbrook's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #12 ) is stricken. This action is dismissed. The Clerk shall enter judgment and terminate the action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/29/2022. (CLM) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting Michael Westbrook El in place of One Nation Irrevocable Trust by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#12

(#12) *Stricken per Order (Doc. #16 )* MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) Modified on 12/2/2022 (CLM). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1 -3) is dismissed with leave to amend. Westbrook, in his personal capacity, is dismissed with prejudice. The remaining Plaintiff in this action must retain counsel by 11/18/2022. Retained counsel for the remaining Plaintiff must file either an Amended Complaint substituting Westbrook, in his capacity as trustee, for the Trust as the remaining Plaintiff in this action, or evidence that the Trust is a business trust, capable of suing in its own name. The Motion to Extend the Deadline to respond to the Complaint (Doc. #9 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/18/2022. (CLM) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE re: Expedited Consideration by Colt 2020-IR Mortgage Loan Trust, Randhir Gandhi Das, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, U.S. Bank National Association re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint . (Neumeyer, Coree) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First American Mortgage Solutions. (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

1 #5

Declaration

1 #4

Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT- Pursuant to the Court's order filed November 29, 2022, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (CLM) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Westbrook's Motion to Amend (Doc. #13 ), which the Court construes as a Motion for Reconsideration, is denied. Westbrook's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #12 ) is stricken. This action is dismissed. The Clerk shall enter judgment and terminate the action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/29/2022. (CLM) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) *Denied at (Doc. #16 )* LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint re: #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting Michael Westbrook El in place of One Nation Irrevocable Trust. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Michael Westbrook El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CLM) Modified on 12/2/2022 (CLM). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting Michael Westbrook El in place of One Nation Irrevocable Trust by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) *Stricken per Order (Doc. #16 )* MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Westbrook El. (CLM) Modified on 12/2/2022 (CLM). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1 -3) is dismissed with leave to amend. Westbrook, in his personal capacity, is dismissed with prejudice. The remaining Plaintiff in this action must retain counsel by 11/18/2022. Retained counsel for the remaining Plaintiff must file either an Amended Complaint substituting Westbrook, in his capacity as trustee, for the Trust as the remaining Plaintiff in this action, or evidence that the Trust is a business trust, capable of suing in its own name. The Motion to Extend the Deadline to respond to the Complaint (Doc. #9 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/18/2022. (CLM) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE re: Expedited Consideration by Colt 2020-IR Mortgage Loan Trust, Randhir Gandhi Das, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, U.S. Bank National Association re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint . (Neumeyer, Coree) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Colt 2020-IR Mortgage Loan Trust, Randhir Gandhi Das, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neumeyer, Coree) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, Randhir Gandhi Das. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First American Mortgage Solutions. (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21198450. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1752-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association. (Neumeyer, Coree) (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Neumeyer, Coree) (ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-094017. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21198450 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, Randhir Gandhi Das, U.S. Bank National Association. (Neumeyer, Coree) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(ARC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLU- is a litigant

Latest cases where MERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant