This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 07:57:26 (UTC).

OMG Accessories LLC v. K7 Design Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 OMG Accessories LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against K7 Design Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09304

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OMG ACCESSORIES LLC

Defendants

WALMART INC.

K7 DESIGN GROUP, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Paola Chery

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #2

Exhibit B

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by OMG Accessories LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #8 Letter filed by OMG Accessories LLC. ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may refile its Complaint with the exhibits attached thereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/12/2020) (ama) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Stephanie Chery dated 11/10/2020 re: Permission to Correct Docket Entry. Document filed by OMG Accessories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Stephanie Paola Chery to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to K7 Design Group, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephanie Paola Chery. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC..(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to K7 Design Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC..(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC..(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against K7 DESIGN GROUP, Inc., WALMART INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22457449)Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC..(Chery, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K7 Design Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant