This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:38:02 (UTC).

Omega v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Omega filed an Other lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Lurana S. Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62385

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mimaye Omega

Mimaye Omegat

Defendant

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Bavaro

Attorney at Loan Lawyers

3201 Griffin Roadsuite 100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

Chase Everett Jenkins

Attorney at Jenkins Lorenzo

18851 Ne 29Th Ave.Suite 700

Aventura, FL 33180

Jorge Damian Lorenzo

Attorney at Jenkins Lorenzo, LLC

18851 Ne 29Th Avenuesuite 700

Aventura, FL 33180

Defendant Attorney

Wesley Lawrence Ridout

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

50 North Laura Streetsuite 3900

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summon(s) Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (drz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wesley Lawrence Ridout on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Attorney Wesley Lawrence Ridout added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft). (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion [DE 7] is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until January 4, 2022 to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC response/answer due 1/4/2022 Per Order DE#8 . (drz) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion [DE 7] is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until January 4, 2022 to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wesley Lawrence Ridout on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Attorney Wesley Lawrence Ridout added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft). (Ridout, Wesley) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (drz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15192862, filed by Mimaye Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s) Summons)(Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant