This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 09:25:17 (UTC).

Omega Patents, LLC v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Omega Patents, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01907

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omega Patents, LLC

Defendants

Bayerische Motoren Werke AG

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan T. Santurri

Attorney at Allen Dyer Doppelt Milbrath & Gilchrist

P.O. Box 3791, 255 South Orange Avenue, Suite 1401

Orlando, FL 32802-3791

Brian R. Gilchrist

Attorney at Allen Dyer Doppelt Milbrath & Gilchrist

P.O. Box 3791, 255 South Orange Avenue, Suite 1401

Orlando, FL 32802-3791

Dan Robert Gresham

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP Atl

Suite 1600E, 3200 Windy Hill Road, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Cynthia Jeannette Lee

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP Atl

Suite 1600E, 3200 Windy Hill Road, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Kai Rajan

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner-DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

Courtney Kasuboski

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner-DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

Samhitha Muralidhar Medatia

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP-Atl

Suite 1400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Robert Benjamin Cassady

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner-DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

Kara A. Specht

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP-Atl

Suite 1400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Lionel M. Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner-VA

Two Freedom Square, 11955 Freedom Dr.

Reston, VA 20190

Kevin J. Spinella

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner-DC

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appoint a Special Process Server. Omega must serve BMW in accordance with any internationally agreed means, the laws of Germany, or as permitted by this Court, if not otherwise prohibited by international agreement or the laws of Germany, in a manner reasonably calculated to give BMW notice of this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/9/2020. (jed) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#39

(#39) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Spinella, Kevin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#38

(#38) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Rajan, Kai) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#37

(#37) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#36

(#36) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#35

(#35) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Cassady, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

34 #2

Text of Proposed Order

34 #1

Exhibit A - Email

#34

(#34) MOTION Appoint Special Process Server with Brief In Support by Omega Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Santurri, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#7

(#35) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Cassady, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

(#6) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#5

(#5) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Omega Patents, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Omega Patents, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9651233) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/05/2020)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appoint a Special Process Server. Omega must serve BMW in accordance with any internationally agreed means, the laws of Germany, or as permitted by this Court, if not otherwise prohibited by international agreement or the laws of Germany, in a manner reasonably calculated to give BMW notice of this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/9/2020. (jed) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Spinella, Kevin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Rajan, Kai) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Cassady, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION Appoint Special Process Server with Brief In Support by Omega Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Santurri, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Courtney Kasuboski re #33 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #25 Application of Courtney S. Kasuboski for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/1/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kevin Spinella re #32 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan T. Santurri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9696010).by Omega Patents, LLC. (Lee, Cynthia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Gresham, Dan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Lee, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 12, 2020. (ash) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Omega Patents, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Omega Patents, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9651233) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omega Patents, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samhitha Muralidhar Medatia