This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2019 at 08:25:30 (UTC).

O'mara v. Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 O'mara filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00595

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian A. O'mara

Defendant

Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Dan C. Oyasato

Attorney at Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

888 Mililani St, 2Nd Floor, 523-0702, Fax: 538-1927

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

6 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#6

5 #1

Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements

#5

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/20/2019. (jo) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY. 12.16 Submission of Proposed Orders. Please be advised that document #11 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; Order filed by Brian A. O'mara requires court approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Brian A. O'mara. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian A. O'mara. Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages served on 11/18/2019. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(ens) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 12/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(ens) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00595 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (ens) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Brian A. O'mara Notice of Related Cases Brian A. O'mara. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Brian A. O'mara. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2284341.), filed by Brian A. O'mara.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan C. Oyasato