This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:43:47 (UTC).

Omanovic et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Omanovic filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Felipe Acre

Houston, TX 77007

Maja Omanovic

Houston, TX 77007

Felipe Armaza Acre

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Patrick Barton

Attorney at Barton Law Firm

1201 Shepherd Dr

Houston, TX 77007

Wayne D Collins

Attorney at Barton Law Firm

1201 Shepherd Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

John M Causey

Attorney at Hope Causey PC

Po Box 3188

Conroe, TX 77305

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Harris County District Court, case number 2019-80144 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23889096) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Felipe Armaza Acre, Maja Omanovic, filed.(Collins, Wayne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter from John M Causey re: Vacation Notice, filed. (agould, 3) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

4 #1

Appendix Produced Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Produced Documents)(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from John M Causey re: Vacation Notice, filed. (agould, 3) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Felipe Armaza Acre, Maja Omanovic, filed.(Collins, Wayne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Produced Documents)(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Harris County District Court, case number 2019-80144 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23889096) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Causey, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.