This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 08:02:15 (UTC).

Olumba v. Western World Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Olumba against Western World Insurance Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03818

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sebastian Olumba

Defendant

Western World Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shane A McClelland

Attorney at Law Offices of Shane McClelland

440 Cobia Drive, Suite 101

Katy, TX 77494

Defendant Attorney

Robert G Hogue

Attorney at Attorney at Law

4514 Cole Ave, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75205-4193

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Appendix

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sebastian Olumba, filed.(McClelland, Shane) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 164th District Court Harris County, case number 201958814 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23300061) filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogue, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 04:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sebastian Olumba, filed.(McClelland, Shane) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 04:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 164th District Court Harris County, case number 201958814 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23300061) filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogue, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.