This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2021 at 18:46:46 (UTC).

Olszeski v. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Olszeski filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Women's Health and Urology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Adams and Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01787

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John R. Adams

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Olszeski

Jane O. Tortola

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Gynecare

Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

Johnson & Johnson

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James W. Slater

Attorney at Slater & Zurz

One Cascade Plaza

Akron, OH 44308

Sean C. Buchanan

Attorney at Slater & Zurz

One Cascade Plaza

Akron, OH 44308

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman - Dallas

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

B. Scott Kruka

Attorney at Martin Baughman

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Ben C. Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman - Dallas

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Jeffrey S. Grand

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard

28Th Floor, 10 East 40 Street

New York, NY 10016

Daniel C. Burke

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard

28Th Floor, 10 East 40 Street

New York, NY 10016

Greg A. Vigna

951 North Patterson Avenue

Santa Barbara, CA 93111

Defendant Attorneys

Dustin B. Rawlin

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Brenda A. Sweet

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow - Jackson

210 East Capitol Street, P.O. Box 22567

Jackson, MS 39225-2567

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

300 Summers Street, P.O. Box 25301

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Rita A. Maimbourg

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

William M. Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Kate E. Middleton

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew D. Keenan

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon

One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105-2118

Jon Strongman

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale

Three Gateway Center, Ste. 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Robert T. Adams

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at Flaherty, Sensabaugh & Bonasso - Charleston

200 Capitol Street, P.O. Box 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#76

(#76) Agreed Order and Stipulation regarding Pathology Protocol. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/17/2021. Related document(s) #75 . (JLG) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#74

(#74) Order granting #73 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel L. Wright for Plaintiff Jane Olszeski. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/14/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#72

(#72) Order For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Modify Case Management Order (ECF No #71 ) is granted. The Court extends the discovery and expert cutoff dates and modifies the case management order for this action as set forth herein. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/13/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#71

(#71) Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Modify Case Management Order filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Wildung, Wendy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#70

(#70) Joint Status Report filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Related document(s) #69 .(Hughes, Angela) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#69

(#70) Joint Status Report filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Related document(s) #69 .(Hughes, Angela) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Ethicon, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Rawlin, Dustin) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ethicon Women's Health and Urology on 8/19/2019; Ethicon, Inc. on 8/19/2019; Gynecare on 8/19/2019; Johnson & Johnson on 8/19/2019, filed on behalf of Jane Olszeski. Related document(s) #2 . (P,G) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ethicon Women's Health and Urology on 8/19/2019; Ethicon, Inc. on 8/19/2019; Gynecare on 8/19/2019; Johnson & Johnson on 8/19/2019, filed on behalf of Jane Olszeski. Related document(s) #2 . (P,G) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Summons Johnson & Johnson

1 #4

Summons Ethicon, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Gynecare

1 #2

Summons Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Unopposed Motion to dismiss Ethicon Women's Health & Urology and Gynecare Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Attachment)(Rawlin, Dustin) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Agreed Order and Stipulation regarding Pathology Protocol. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/17/2021. Related document(s) #75 . (JLG) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Pathology Protocol filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Order and Stipulation Regarding Pathology Protocol)(Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Order granting #73 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel L. Wright for Plaintiff Jane Olszeski. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/14/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Motion for attorney Rachel L. Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10567872, filed by Plaintiff Jane Olszeski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Rachel Wright, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Supreme Court Certification, #4 Exhibit Texas Bar Certificate)(Buchanan, Sean) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/13/2021. Present were Attorney Laura J. Baughman as counsel for Plaintiff; Attorneys Brenda A. Sweet and Rita A. Maimbourg as counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson; Attorney Wendy J. Wildung as counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation; and Plaintiff Jane Olszeski. An associate of Attorney Baughman also attended and will be filing a motion for admission pro hac vice. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 7 Minutes. (JLG) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Order For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Modify Case Management Order (ECF No #71 ) is granted. The Court extends the discovery and expert cutoff dates and modifies the case management order for this action as set forth herein. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/13/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Modify Case Management Order filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Wildung, Wendy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRemark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $120.00 submitted for refund on 1/6/2021 for receipt AOHNDC-10464185. (S,NM) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate charge. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10464185, filed by Jane Olszeski. (Buchanan, Sean) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Joint Status Report filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Related document(s) #69 .(Hughes, Angela) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge John R. Adams on 9/11/19. (K,C) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed Motion to dismiss Ethicon Women's Health & Urology and Gynecare Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Attachment)(Rawlin, Dustin) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Attachment)(Rawlin, Dustin) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Ethicon, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Rawlin, Dustin) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ethicon Women's Health and Urology on 8/19/2019; Ethicon, Inc. on 8/19/2019; Gynecare on 8/19/2019; Johnson & Johnson on 8/19/2019, filed on behalf of Jane Olszeski. Related document(s) #2 . (P,G) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ethicon Women's Health and Urology: Type of service: certified mail, receipt # 7017 1450 0001 6886 7566. Ethicon, Inc., receipt # 7017 1450 0001 6886 7580; Gynecare, receipt # 7017 1450 0001 6886 7573 and Johnson & Johnson, receipt # 7017 1450 0001 6886 7597 placed in U.S. Mail. (P,G) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,SR) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9457919. Filed by Jane Olszeski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, #3 Summons Gynecare, #4 Summons Ethicon, Inc., #5 Summons Johnson & Johnson) (Buchanan, Sean) s/ by James Slater. Modified text on 8/7/2019 (S,SR). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant